Augsburger v. Navy Mutual Aid Association

Plaintiff: Rebecca Augsburger
Defendant: Navy Mutual Aid Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01817
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 22 MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Counsel is directed to e-file their Second Amended Complaint (as proposed) within seven (7) days of this Order. (KMP)
August 29, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' 26 STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE AND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2018. Trial and all other deadlines remain as set. (KMP)
March 5, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 17 Stipulated MOTION Model Stipulated Protective Order by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (AE)
December 13, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida GRANTING 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; Navy Mutual Aid Association answer due 12/22/2017. (AE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Augsburger v. Navy Mutual Aid Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Augsburger
Represented By: Joel B. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Mutual Aid Association
Represented By: Emilia L Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?