Kim v. A Place For Mom, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kevin Pine
Defendant: A Place For Mom Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01826
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER pursuant to parties' 113 Stipulation; RENOTING defendant's 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Second Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Stay : Noting Date 11/30/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 11, 2018 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY. Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint within fourteen (14) days by 8/28/2018. Discovery, including class-related discovery, remains stayed pending further order of the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) Modified docket text on 10/11/2018 (SWT).
August 28, 2018 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 50 Motion to Dismiss; striking as moot plaintiff's 105 Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoenas; This matter is STAYED pending a decision of the US Court of Appeals for th e Ninth Circuit in Marks V. Crunch San Diego, LLC; directing parties to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen days after the Ninth Circuit issues a disposition in Marks or by 12/31/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 17, 2018 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 97 Motion to Seal, Dkts. 98 and 99 shall remain under seal; granting parties' 101 Stipulated Motion to seal, Dkt. 96 shall remain under seal; granting in part parties' 95 Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines; striking deadlines for completing class-related discovery and for filing any motion related to class certification; staying plaintiff's 90 Motion to Compel Discovery. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
June 18, 2018 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 80 Joint Stipulated Motion and Order to Extend Class Certification Deadlines by Three Weeks Pending Mediation. The deadline for completing discovery on class certification issues is EXTENDED to August 6, 2018. The deadline for filing any motions related to class certification is EXTENDED to August 23, 2018. All other dates and deadlines set forth in the Minute Order Setting Trial and Related Dates, docket no. 63 , and in the Minute Order entered June 7, 2018, docket no. 77 , shall remain in full force and effect. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
June 7, 2018 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking hearing scheduled for 6/27/2018 at 10:00 AM; granting in part and denying in part parties' 76 Stipulated Motion; RENOTING defendant's 50 Motion to Dismiss: Noting Date 7/13/2018; ORDERING parties to mediate by 7 /6/2018; EXTENDING deadlines for discovery on class certification issues to 7/16/2018 and motions related to class certification to 8/2/2018. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report indicating whether they have reached a settlement in principle by 7/9/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 18, 2018 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying defendant's 74 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority; RENOTING defendant's 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Noting Date 6/15/2018. Oral Argument is SET for 6/27/2018 at 10:00am. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 18, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Certain Deadlines re parties' 70 Stipulation; Deadline to complete discovery on class certification issues extended to 6/18/2018, Deadline to file any motions related to class certification extended to 7/19/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 29, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
March 8, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Withdraw the Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification; striking Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Extension the Deadline to File Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 5, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 51 Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 16, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5 days; Jury Trial is set for 5/13/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Discovery on all class certification issues completed by 4/23/2018, Any motions related to class certificati on must be filed by 6/21/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/4/2018, Motions due by 9/20/2018, Remaining discovery completed by 10/18/2018, Dispositive motions due by 12/1 3/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2018, Motions in Limine due by 3/28/2019, Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/26/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/26/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. A Place For Mom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Place For Mom Inc
Represented By: James G Snell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: James F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pine
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sharon M Lee
Represented By: Jonathan D Selbin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John Tate Spragens(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?