Cody, Inc. v. Falsetti

Plaintiff: Cody Inc
Defendant: Dana Falsetti and Does
Counter_claimant: Dana Falsetti
Counter_defendant: Cody Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01833
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 28 ) re parties' 33 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) Modified on 4/12/2018 to edit docket text to add relationship to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (TH).
March 8, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Dismiss with respect to her counterclaims. Because Ms. Falsetti has properly pleaded affirmative defenses and denials, the Court denies Cody's Motion to Strike her affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
February 14, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cody, Inc. v. Falsetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Inc
Represented By: Stephen C Gerrish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Misasha S Graham(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andrew P. Holland(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ashley K Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Falsetti
Represented By: Laraine M.I. Burrell
Represented By: Brian C Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dana Falsetti
Represented By: Laraine M.I. Burrell
Represented By: Brian C Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cody Inc
Represented By: Stephen C Gerrish
Represented By: Misasha S Graham
Represented By: Andrew P. Holland
Represented By: Ashley K Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?