Rubatino v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Francis H. Rubatino Jr.
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01834
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Second Order to Show Cause by Judge David W. Christel. Plaintiff has shown cause.(SH)
March 20, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - by Judge David W. Christel. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2018. (SH)
March 12, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - by Judge David W. Christel. Plaintiff must provide proof of service or show cause on or before March 19, 2018. (SH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubatino v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis H. Rubatino Jr.
Represented By: M Tha Win
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?