State of Washington v. Matheson Flight Extenders Inc
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: Matheson Flight Extenders Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01925
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 100 Stipulated Motion: It is hereby ORDERED, that this Agreed Order is APPROVED and ENTERED by the COURT, and this case shall be DISMISSED. Except for payment of the Settlement Funds set forth in Section 6.1 above, each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(ELS)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying Defendant's 95 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (LH)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's 71 Motion to Vacate Unexpired Pretrial Deadlines, and Requesting Status Conference. The Court officially VACATES the trial date. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying Defendant's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 63 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Trial Date and Stay All Unexpired Pretrial Deadlines; vacating the November 4, 2019 trial date; staying all pretrial deadlines that had not expired before 9/25/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(SWT)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulated Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. The dispositive motions deadline is EXTENDED to 8/15/2019. All other deadlines remain in place. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting parties' 25 Motion to Compel and granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Amend Pretrial Deadlines. Defendant is ORDERED to produce all of the documentation that it did for Ms. Richardson for the 35 employees identified in Int errogatory 10, within 21 days of the date of this order. The discovery cutoff deadline is EXTENDED to 7/8/2019 and the dispositive motions deadline is EXTENDED to 8/6/2019. The proposed pretrial order is due by 10/25/2019. Trial briefs, proposed voir dire, and jury instructions are due by 10/31/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Remand signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. Matheson Flight Extenders Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Represented By: Mitchell Alan Riese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matheson Flight Extenders Inc
Represented By: John Bradley Bigos
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?