Kunack v. The Boeing Company

Plaintiff: Kelly Kunack
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00214
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Length of Trial: 3-5 days; Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 1/21/2020. Motions related to expert witnesses due by 10/3/2019, Discovery completed by 8/30/2019, Dispositive motions due by 9/26/2019, Motion to amend complaint filing deadline is 5/31/2019, Motions in Limine due by 11/21/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 0:30 PM. Trial Briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/3/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant The Boeing Company's 32 Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw and Postpone Deadline. Discovery deadline is extended to 6/14/2019. Parties are ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on 5/29/2019 at 11:00 AM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff with 32 Defendant's Response)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's counsel's 26 Motion to Withdraw; directing plaintiff's counsel to send a copy of this Minute Order to client and file proof of service within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorney Judith A Lonnquist terminated.)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial (6 days) is set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Motions related to expert witnesses due by 6/20/2019, Discovery comp leted by 5/13/2019, Motions in Limine due by 8/1/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/16/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Postpone Dates; granting Defendant's 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: deadline to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 4/13/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/4/2018, Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kunack v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kunack
Represented By: Judith A Lonnquist
Represented By: Jennifer Tyler Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Lincoln O Bisbee(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alana F. Genderson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?