DeJaVu Tukwila, Inc. v. City of Tukwila

Plaintiff: DeJaVu Tukwila Inc
Defendant: City of Tukwila
Case Number: 2:2018cv00228
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant re parties' 25 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 6, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint re parties' 21 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
July 17, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing US Magistrate Judge James P Donohue as settlement judge. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 7, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeJaVu Tukwila, Inc. v. City of Tukwila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeJaVu Tukwila Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Kaplan
Represented By: Gilbert Henry Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tukwila
Represented By: Kendra R. Comeau
Represented By: Jayne Lyn Freeman
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?