Silva v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Silva
Defendant: Michael Foods, Inc., M.G. Waldbaum Company, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Michael Foods Inc and Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00324
Filed: March 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (TH)
June 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Jaime Silva (Berman, Steve)
June 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, having extended the deadline for defendants third request to respond and in the interest of judicial economy, hereby orders the Status Conference RESET from 6/12/2018 to 8/21/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
May 31, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #12 Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Extending Related Deadlines. The deadline to answer or otherwise file a motion in response to Plaintiff's complaint is 7/2/2018. If Defendants file a motion in response to the Complaint, the deadline to file a motion is tolled until Defendants answer the Complaint and the deadline is extended thirty (30) days after Defendants have answered the Complaint. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 29, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Extending Related Deadlines by parties (Hineline, Curt)
May 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Curt Roy Hineline on behalf of Defendants M.G. Waldbaum Company, Michael Foods Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Hineline, Curt)
April 3, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #9 Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines; deadline to file motion or answer to Complaint is 6/4/2018, deadline to file opposition in response to such motion is 7/2/2018, deadline to file reply in support of such motion is 7/16/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 2, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MICHAEL FOODS, INC. AND M.G. WALDBAUM COMPANY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES, AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by parties (Byszewski, Elaine)
March 30, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #7 Stipulated Motion
March 29, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES, AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by parties (Byszewski, Elaine)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 6, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 6/12/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) M.G. Waldbaum Company, Michael Foods Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Michael Foods, #2 Summons-M.G. Waldbaum)(RE)
March 5, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elaine T Byszewski for Plaintiff Jaime Silva, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 2, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elaine T. Byszewski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jaime Silva (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5223357 (Berman, Steve)
March 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) M.G. Waldbaum Company, Michael Foods, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5223255) Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Jaime Silva(pty:pla), filed by Jaime Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #3 Summons Michael Foods, Inc., #4 Summons M.G. Waldbaum Company)(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.G. Waldbaum Company
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Foods Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Silva
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?