Morgan v. United States of America

Petitioner: Seth Morgan
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00374
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioners responsive brief in support of his petition shall be filed no later than October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail
August 16, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner to resubmit his Second Amended Petition by no later than 9/4/2018; re Petitioner's 22 Letter. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner with original document ( 21 ) via USPS)
June 15, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Government's 5 Emergency Motion Regarding Wavier of Attorney-Client Privilege and Request for Extension of Time to Answer Petitioner's 28 USC 2255 Motion. Government's answer to Petitioner's 1 2255 Motion is due within 45 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via fist class mail; Micahel Iaria via ECF Ad hoc
May 8, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 7 Motion to Amend Habeas Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government's Motion to Waive Attorney-Client Privilege (Dkt. No. 5 ) is RE-NOTED to May 25; Petitioner will have until May 22 to file a respo nse. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government will have 45 days from the issuance of the Court's order on its pending motion to file its answer to the habeas petition. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) (cc: Petitioner via first class mail)
April 26, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying the Government's 5 Emergency Motion Regarding Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Request for Extension of Time to Answer. Any response to the pending petition is also STAYED until the Court has ruled on the 7 request to file an amended petition. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail
March 14, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the United States to Answer Petitioner's 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Answer due within 45 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Seth Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Shapiro Cohen(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Catherine L Crisham(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Benjamin T. Diggs(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?