Stewart v. People's Bank

Plaintiff: Lana Stewart
Defendant: People's Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv00383
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date as follows: Length of Trial-8 days; Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 9/16/2019. Motions in Limine due by 8/15/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 01:30 PM. Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/26/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 12, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 21 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines as follows; Jury Trial is set for 6/24/2019. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/5/2019, Motions d ue by 12/6/2018, Discovery completed by 1/28/2019, Dispositive motions due by 2/28/2019, Daubert Motions due by 3/7/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/23/2019, Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/7/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/7/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 7, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 18 Stipulated MOTION signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
May 29, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Withdrawal re parties' 14 Stipulation; Tina Aiken and Darren Feider shall be substituted as counsel for Defendant People's Bank, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorney Jeffrey P Fairchild terminated)
May 2, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re Attorney Jeffrey Fairchild's 9 Notice of Withdrawal; does not comply with LCR 83.2(b) and has no effect. Mr. Fairchild shall either file a motion with an appropriate certification and proof of service on defendant or a stipulation and proposed order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. People's Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Stewart
Represented By: Nolan Patrick Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's Bank
Represented By: Tina M Aiken
Represented By: Jeffrey P Fairchild
Represented By: Darren Anthony Feider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?