Trevino et al v. Quigley et al
Plaintiff: Francis Anthony Trevino and Mark Newton Kelly
Defendant: Kevin W. Quigley, Gregory D. Sypolt, James M. Murphy, Erin L. Lennon, Susan L. Carlson and Dorothy Sawyer
Case Number: 2:2018cv00487
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 20 Request that the court send him all original documents that were filed in this matter. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiff Trevino via first class mail
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER dismissing matter without prejudice for failure to serve Defendants within the time period set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Trevino via first class mail
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Plaintiff Mark Newton Kelly's 16 Notice. The court DISMISSES Mr. Kelly as a party and his claims without prejudice. In addition, the court ORDERS Mr. Trevino not to file any additional documents in this case on Mr. Kelly's behalf. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (cc: Plaintiffs via first class mail)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying Plaintiffs' 10 Second Motion for Reconsideration; denying Plaintiffs' 11 Motion for interlocutory review. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause by 8/17/2018, why the court should not dismiss the case without prejudice for Plaintiffs' failure to serve Defendants. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via fist class mail
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims against defendants James M. Murphy, Gregory D. Sypolt, Susan L. Carlson and Erin L. Lennon. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiffs to show cause why Judicial Defendants should not be dismissed from this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiffs via first class mail
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevino et al v. Quigley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Anthony Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Newton Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin W. Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Sypolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin L. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?