Providence Health & Services et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al
Plaintiff: Providence Health & Services and Swedish Health Services
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Syndicate 2623/623 Beazley and Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00495
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing all claims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Syndicate 2623/623 (Beazley) in this matter may be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party re 140 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Parties' 101 Agreed Motion to Stay Proceeding During Public Health Emergency. Case is stayed for 60 days, and all existing case deadlines are continued indefinitely. The parties shall submit a joint status report at the conclusion of the stay. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Federal Insurance Company per Parties' 99 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Federal Insurance Company terminated)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting parties' 95 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date. Jury Trial is re-set for 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. A new scheduling order will be issued shortly. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting parties' 81 Stipulated Motion to Modify Case Schedule and Continue Trial Date. Jury Trial is set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court will issue a new case schedule consistent with this new trial date. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: parties' 78 Joint Statement Regarding Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying parties' 74 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying Defendants' 68 Motion for interlocutory review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1292(b), denying Defendant Federal's 69 72 Motions for Joinder. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER striking the Court's 62 Judgment in a Civil Case. The Court's Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 61 ) remains untouched. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying Defendants' 36 and 40 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LW)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 50 Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Surreply. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment re parties' 33 Stipulation; File cross motions by 6/15/2018, File response briefs by 7/13/2018, File reply briefs by 7/27/2018, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline re parties' 29 Stipulation; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/18/2018, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 14 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Federal Insurance Company to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Federal Insurance Company shall have up to and including April 25, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: 12 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Beazley to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Syndicate 2623/623 shall have up to and including April 25, 2018, to answer or otherwise response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Providence Health & Services et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Chelsey Lyn Mam
Represented By: Brendan Winslow-Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swedish Health Services
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Chelsey Lyn Mam
Represented By: Brendan Winslow-Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Syndicate 2623/623 Beazley
Represented By: Monique M Fuentes(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin F Kieffer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Justin Sean Landreth
Represented By: Peter J Mintzer
Represented By: Ross Smith(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Geoffrey C Bedell
Represented By: Steven Soha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?