Northwest Administrators, Inc v. The American Bottling Company

Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: The American Bottling Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00536
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time re parties' 11 Stipulated Motion; deadline for defendant's answer to complaint is extended to 6/22/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 22, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant The American Bottling Company to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re parties' 9 Stipulated MOTION. The deadline for Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to June 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
May 7, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time re parties' 6 Stipulated Motion; deadline for Defendant's Answer to Complaint is extended to 5/24/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc v. The American Bottling Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Bottling Company
Represented By: Russell S Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?