State of Washington v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency and E. Scott Pruitt
Case Number: 2:2018cv00645
Filed: May 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice per parties' 23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re 19 Joint Status Report & Proposed Order. Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Joint Status Report. Parties to file a Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: Government's unopposed 13 Motion to stay all litigation deadlines until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER for relief from initial deadlines re parties' 6 Stipulated MOTION. The parties are released from the initial disclosure requirements of Rule 26(a)(1), as well as the requirements of Rule 26(f), requiring the parties to prepare a discovery plan. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: William R Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Scott Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?