Mora-Villalpando v. US Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Maria Mora-Villalpando
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Customs and Border Protection and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv00655
Filed: May 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re 59 Joint Status Report. The parties will submit another joint status report within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re 57 . Parties will submit another Joint Status Report within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re 55 . Parties will submit another Joint Status Report within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER re Dkt. 53 . Parties will submit another Joint Status Report within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 39 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendants' 49 Motion for Leave to File Sup plemental Declaration; denying Defendants' surreply request to strike certain portions of Plaintiff's reply memorandum. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within two months of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension re parties' 40 Stipulated Motion: plaintiff to file motion for summary judgment by 4/5/2019, plaintiff will file reply by 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension to file response and cross-motion for summary judgment re parties' 37 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of deadlines re parties' 33 Stipulated Motion: Defendants will file their motion for summary judgment by 12/24/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Defendants' 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora-Villalpando v. US Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mora-Villalpando
Represented By: Khaled Alrabe(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Simpson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Devin T Theriot-Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?