Friends of the Earth v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 2:2018cv00677
Filed: May 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting parties' 33 Third Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline: Plaintiff shall file its cost bill and attorney fee motion on or before 8/8/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting parties' 31 Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline: Plaintiff shall file its cost bill and attorney fee motion on or before 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting parties' 28 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for plaintiff to file cost bill and attorney fee motion. Plaintiff shall file its cost bill and attorney fee motion on or before 3/29/2019. Plaintiff or the parties may seek additional time if there is good cause to do so. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Claim 4 of 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and deferring plaintiff's 16 Motion to Clarify Scope of Review and Extend Certain Deadlines; striking deadline for filing administrative record and filing any motion to supplement the administrative record. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 10 Joint Status Report. The Court sets the following dates and deadlines: Bench Trial is set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly; Deadline for defendant to file any dispositive motion is 8/24/2018; Agreed pretri al order due 6/20/2019; Trial briefs and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law due 6/20/2019; Pretrial conference scheduled for 1:30 p.m. on 6/28/2019. The parties' joint motion, docket no. 11 , to establish a briefing schedule for dispositive motions is GRANTED. The dates and deadlines set forth herein are firm and can be changed only by order of the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing counsel to confer and file a Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of the Earth v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Paul August Kampmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?