Watkins v. ICON Owner Pool 1 West, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Watkins
Defendant: ICON Owner Pool 1 West, LLC and Black & White I-V
Case Number: 2:2018cv00706
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Lawsuit with Prejudice re parties' 23 Stipulation. All claims by Plaintiff Cheryl Watkins against Defendant ICON Owner Pool 1 West, LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties bearing their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
July 10, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 16 Order to Show Cause signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
July 9, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, no later than 7/16/2018, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with 14 Order; Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 30, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement re parties' 11 Stipulated Motion; Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement shall be continued to 6/1/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. ICON Owner Pool 1 West, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Watkins
Represented By: Robert Dean Bohm
Represented By: A. Robert E. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICON Owner Pool 1 West, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Dirk Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & White I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?