Rishor v. USA

Petitioner: Kirk Rishor
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00708
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Stay of Motion to Appoint Counsel & Reply Brief Deadline. The Court requests reply briefing from Petitioner on the Government's "second successive petition" argument; said reply briefing to be filed by no later than August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) (cc: Petitioner via first class mail)
June 26, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the United States to Answer Petitioner's 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Answer due within 45 days of this order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail
June 20, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 2 Motion to Expand the Record. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?