United States of America v. Engen et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Carol L. Engen, King County and Qualstar Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2018cv00712
Filed: May 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying Defendant Engen's 106 Motion for Extension of Time. In responding to the United States' motion for summary judgment, Ms. Engen may not rely on any documents or evidence that should have been disclosed in response to the United States' First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying Defendant's 77 Motion to Join Internal Revenue Service as a Party; denying Defendant-In-Error's 81 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying Defendant-In-Error's 83 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to D efendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause and to Admonish Plaintiff's Counsel to Comply with the Washington State Bar Association's Rules of Professional Conduct; denying Defendant-In-Error's 87 Request for Evidentiary Heari ng and Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiff Should Not Be Required to Produce the Statutory Authority for the United States Legal Tender Demanded by the Plaintiff; granting United States' 89 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint due within 14 days of this Order; denying Defendant-In-Error's 93 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; granting United States' 99 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and for Discovery Sanctions. If Ms. Engen fails to comply with this Order within twenty-one (21) days, the Court will enter default judgment against her in this proceeding. (see order for details) Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER AFFIRMING ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECUSE: The Court AFFIRMS Chief Judge Martinez's order declining to recuse and DENIES Defendant's Affidavit of Prejudice and Motion to Recuse Ricardo S. Martinez. Dkt. # 75 . Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(SR)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECUSE re Defendant Carol Engen's 75 MOTION for Recusal. In accordance with the Court's local rules, see LOCAL RULE W.D.WASH. LCR 3(f), this order is REFERRED to the Honorable United States District Judge Richard A. Jones for review. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting the United States' 64 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. All of Ms. Engen's counterclaims against the Government are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting the Parties' 62 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting Defendant Engen's 55 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer 49 . Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Defendant Engen's 47 Motion for Continuance of Scheduling Deadlines. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/17/2020, Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2020. The Court STRIKES, as procedurally improper: "Defendant's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Dkt. # 46 ); and Defendant's Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Dkt. # 49 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Defendant's 27 Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendant's 38 Motion for a Fair and Impartial Hearing. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez granting 41 Motion to Continue: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/26/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/1/2020, Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2020.(LC)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AFFIRMING ORDER DECLINING TO RECUSE AND DENYING DEFENDANT ENGEN'S 29 MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re Defendant Carol Engen's 29 Notice of Abuse of Judicial Discretion. The Court construes Defendant's Notice as a Motion for Recusal and denies the motion. This Order is REFERRED to the Honorable Benjamin H. Settle for review. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER LIFTING BANKRUPTCY STAY. The Clerk shall LIFT the STAY in this matter. Defendants SHALL properly respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than ten days from the date this Order is entered. The Clerk will issue an Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report in due time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Jason Wilson-Aguilar, Carol L. Engen via USPS
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the outcome of Defendant Engen's bankruptcy proceedings; parties to notify the Court when the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded and/or if the status of the automatic stay changes for other reasons. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Defendant Engen, Bankruptcy Trustee K. Michael Fitzgerald; Attorney Richard Wotipka via U.S. Mail
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Engen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yen Jeannette Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol L. Engen
Represented By: Richard John Wotipka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Margaret A Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualstar Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?