Clayton et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William R. Clayton and Jill D. Clayton
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, IMO Industries Inc, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Saberhagen Holdings Inc, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc, Warren Pumps LLC, Vigor Shipyards Inc, Lone Star Industries Inc and General Electric Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00748
Filed: May 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 115 Motion to exclude Mr. Dotson's expert dose reconstruction opinions. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting Defendant's 150 Motion for Limited Discovery on Cause of Death. The deadline to disclose expert testimony is extended to 12/16/2019, for the sole purpose of allowing the parties to disclose expert reports (or amendments to curr ent expert reports) on Mr. Clayton's cause of death. The deadline to complete discovery is extended to 1/31/2020, following limited purposes only. Motions related to this additional discovery must be filed by 1/10/2020. Motions challenging expert witness testimony on Mr. Claytons cause of death must befiled by 2/17/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.'s 139 Motion to Continue Trial. The Clerk is directed to set a new trial date at the end of the court's trial calendar and a corresponding pretr ial schedule. All pretrial deadlines that have passed will not be rescheduled except that the court allows Syd Carpenter to conduct limited discovery on Mrs. Clayton and the two Clayton heirs on the issue of damages. Any such discovery must be completed by November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 103 Motion to Amend and Re-Plead Personal Injury as a Wrongful Death and Survivorship Actions. Plaintiff may file her Amended Complaint attached to her Motion with this Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.'s 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting Plaintiffs' 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re parties' 131 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Air & Liquid Systems Corporation terminated.)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all Plaintiffs' claims against Electrolux with prejudice re parties' 98 Stipulation filed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Electrolux Home Products, Inc. terminated.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing plaintiffs' claims against defendant Warren Pumps LLC with prejudice and without costs to any party re parties' 83 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Warren Pumps LLC terminated.)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline re parties' 79 Stipulated Motion: Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/3/2019, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant North Coast Electric Company re parties' 71 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' claims against defendant North Coast Electric Company only are dismissed with prejudice, reserving to plaintiffs their claims against all other parties. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER to Consolidate re parties' 69 Stipulated MOTION. All future pleadings in this matter shall bear the case number C18-0748JLR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Crown & Cork Seal Company, Inc. re parties' 67 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc terminated.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing with prejudice all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant CBS Corporation per 65 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 Stipulation; dismissing all claims against Defendants Metalclad, LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company without prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Defendant Saberhagen's 39 Motion for judgment on the pleadings; denying Plaintiffs' request for a Rule 56(d) continuance; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 47 Motion for relief from a deadline. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 29 Motion for an expedited trial. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Defendant Hopeman Brothers Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation re parties' 34 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Union Carbide Corporation terminated.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Clayton
Represented By: Ruby K. Aliment
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Glenn S Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill D. Clayton
Represented By: Ruby K. Aliment
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Glenn S Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Patricia T.O. Pearson
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Michael Mackenzie Brown
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saberhagen Holdings Inc
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Shipyards Inc
Represented By: Walter Eugene Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?