Berkelhammer v. Funko, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Satyanarayana Kanugonda and Carl Berkelhammer
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp., Brian Mariotti, Adam Kriger, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Diane Irvine, Russell Nickel, Gino Dellomo, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Goldman Sachs & Co., Ken Brotman, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., Jefferies LLC, Richard McNally, BMO Capital Markets Corp, Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co, ACON Investments, L.L.C., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Funko, Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co and Fundamental Capital, LLC
Petitioner: A. Parikh
Case Number: 2:2018cv00812
Filed: June 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Janissa Ann Strabuk for Plaintiff Carl Berkelhammer. (Strabuk, Janissa)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER APPLYING STAY OF CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES [DKT. #42 ] TO DEFENDANT FUNDAMENTAL CAPITAL, LLC signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carla M Wirtschafter for Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James L Sanders for Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 57 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carla M. Wirtschafter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5838574 (Willey, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 56 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James L. Sanders FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5838571 (Willey, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 55 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Applying Stay of Certain Case Deadlines [Dkt. #42 ] to Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC, filed by Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC. Noting Date 7/9/2019, (Willey, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Fundamental Capital Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Rich McNally, Other Affiliate Kevin Keenley for Fundamental Capital, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fundamental Capital, LLC (Willey, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen C Willey on behalf of Defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC. (Willey, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Stellman Keehnel for Defendants Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, Russell Nickel. (Keehnel, Stellman)
June 10, 2019 Filing 51 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant ACON Investments, L.L.C. on 5/24/2019 (Laughlin, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Fundamental Capital, LLC mailed on 5/16/2019 (Laughlin, Thomas)
May 8, 2019 Filing 49 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) ACON Investments, L.L.C., Fundamental Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Fundamental Capital, LLC) (PM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 48 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #45 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Carl Berkelhammer (Attachments: #1 Summons ACON Investments, L.L.C., #2 Summons Fundamental Capital, LLC)(Laughlin, Thomas)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #46 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey P Jacobson for Plaintiff Carl Berkelhammer, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 46 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey P. Jacobson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Movant Carl Berkelhammer (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5750031 (Stephens, Kim)
April 30, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) BMO Capital Markets Corp, Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co, Diane Irvine, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Russell Nickel, Piper Jaffray & Co, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc, ACON Investments, L.L.C., Fundamental Capital, LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by Carl Berkelhammer.(Laughlin, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp, Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc (Wechkin, Robin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendants BMO Capital Markets Corp, Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. (Wechkin, Robin)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting parties' #41 Stipulated Motion Staying Certain Case Deadlines. Lead plaintiff's amended complaint due by 4/30/2019. Defendants' answer/response STAYED pending ruling on motion to dismiss in state case. Stipulated proposed scheduling order due within 14 days of entry of state court order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LW)
April 9, 2019 NOTE: Document #41 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Robin Wechkin is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. This can be corrected by filing a notice of appearance. (SWT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Staying Certain Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss in Parallel State Court Action, filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. Noting Date 4/9/2019, (Stephens, Kim)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiff Carl Berkelhammer's #37 Renewed Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 2, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY, filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer, TO RESPONSE to #37 MOTION Renewed Motion and Memorandum of Law for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel (Strabuk, Janissa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Thomas L. Laughlin, IV filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer re #37 MOTION Renewed Motion and Memorandum of Law for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stephens, Kim)
December 17, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION Renewed Motion and Memorandum of Law for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel , filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/4/2019, (Stephens, Kim)
October 19, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF PUBLICATION re #35 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ; filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. (George, Colin)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying Movant Carl Berkelhammer's #29 Motion and Memorandum of Law of Carl Berkelhammer for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas L. Laughlin, IV for Carl Berkelhammer, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas L. Laughlin, IV FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Movant Carl Berkelhammer (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5473828 (Stephens, Kim)
September 11, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY, filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer, TO RESPONSE to #29 MOTION and Memorandum of Law of Carl Berkelhammer for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel (Stephens, Kim)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer, move, or otherwise respond pending appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel re #28 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Thomas L. Laughlin filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer re #29 MOTION and Memorandum of Law of Carl Berkelhammer for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Stephens, Kim)
August 27, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION and Memorandum of Law of Carl Berkelhammer for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel , filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/14/2018, (Stephens, Kim)
August 27, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by parties (Keehnel, Stellman)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin Naftalis for Defendants Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, and for Russell Nickel, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin M McDonough for Defendants Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, and for Russell Nickel, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 29, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin Naftalis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, Russell Nickel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5378775 (Keehnel, Stellman)
June 29, 2018 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin M. McDonough FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, Russell Nickel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5378750 (Keehnel, Stellman)
June 29, 2018 Attorney Stellman Keehnel added for defendants for Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally and Russell Nickel per #23 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
June 28, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Ian Freeburg on behalf of Defendants Ken Brotman, Gino Dellomo, Charles Denson, Funko, Inc, Diane Irvine, Adam Kriger, Brian Mariotti, Richard McNally, Russell Nickel. (Freeburg, David)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Movant A. Parikh's #4 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel; striking as moot interested party Carl Berkelhammer's #15 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Appointment as LeadPlaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, or Alternatively to Set a Briefing Schedule for Lead Plaintiff Motions. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 25, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Movant A. Parikh re #15 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, or Alternatively to Set a Briefing Schedule for Lead Plaintiff Motions (George, Colin)
June 25, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Movant A. Parikh, to #15 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, or Alternatively to Set a Briefing Schedule for Lead Plaintiff Motions. Oral Argument Requested. (George, Colin)
June 22, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Movant A. Parikh re #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel (George, Colin)
June 22, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Movant A. Parikh, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel (George, Colin)
June 18, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Thomas L. Laughlin, IV filed by Movant Carl Berkelhammer re #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stephens, Kim)
June 18, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Movant Carl Berkelhammer, to #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel. (Stephens, Kim)
June 15, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #14 Notice of Appearance, #15 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, or Alternatively to Set a Briefing Schedule for Lead Plaintiff Motions, #13 Notice of Appearance: corrected party role from Interested Party to Movant re: Carl Berkelhammer. (PM)
June 15, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, #5 Declaration: corrected name of filer from Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda to Movant A. Parikh. (PM)
June 14, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, or Alternatively to Set a Briefing Schedule for Lead Plaintiff Motions, filed by Interested Party Movant Carl Berkelhammer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/29/2018, (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 6/15/2018 to edit party role of Berkelhammer (PM).
June 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Janissa Ann Strabuk on behalf of Interested Party Carl Berkelhammer. (Strabuk, Janissa) Modified on 6/15/2018 to edit party role of Berkelhammer (PM).
June 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kim D Stephens on behalf of Interested Party Movant Carl Berkelhammer. (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 6/15/2018 to edit party role of Berkelhammer (PM).
June 11, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on J.P. Morgan Securities LLC on 6/8/2018, filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. (George, Colin)
June 11, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Goldman Sachs & Co. on 6/8/2018, filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. (George, Colin)
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Funko, Inc. on 6/7/2018, filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. (George, Colin)
June 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Colin M George on behalf of Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda, Movant A. Parikh. (George, Colin)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Phillip C. Kim for Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 6, 2018 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. Summonses issued at intake counter for all defendants. (CDA)
June 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Spencer Hall, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda, Movant A. Parikh. (Hall, Spencer)
June 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
June 6, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (DJ)
June 4, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Phillip Kim filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda Movant A. Parikh re #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel (George, Colin) Modified on 6/15/2018 to correct name of filer (PM).
June 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Choice of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda Movant A. Parikh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/22/2018, (George, Colin) Modified on 6/15/2018 to correct name of filer (PM).
June 4, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Phillip Kim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5342714 (George, Colin)
June 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Satyanarayana Kanugonda. (George, Colin)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5342696) Attorney Colin M George added to party Satyanarayana Kanugonda (pty:pla), filed by Satyanarayana Kanugonda.(George, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkelhammer v. Funko, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mariotti
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kriger
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Irvine
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Nickel
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gino Dellomo
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Brotman
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Denson
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funko, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McNally
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACON Investments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funko, Inc
Represented By: Kevin M McDonough
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Benjamin Naftalis
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co
Represented By: Robin Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fundamental Capital, LLC
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Represented By: James L Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satyanarayana Kanugonda
Represented By: Colin M George
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Spencer Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Berkelhammer
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Janissa Ann Strabuk
Represented By: Thomas L. Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A. Parikh
Represented By: Colin M George
Represented By: Spencer Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?