McClellon v. Capital One Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Donte McClellon
Defendant: Capital One Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00909
Filed: June 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AFFIRMING ORDER DECLINING TO RECUSE VOLUNTARILY signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Vacate, Reopen, Recuse. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 36 Report and Recommendations and 30 Application to appeal IFP by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail/ 9th Circuit via ECF
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER REFERRING Plaintiff's 30 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis to the Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Reconsideration authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Reconsideration authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Vacate the Court's Judgment signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff failed to respond. Therefore, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court granted Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint and failed to do so within the Court-ordered deadline. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this order, Plaintiff shall show cause why his case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with leave to amend. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, he must do so within 14 days from the issuance of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. If McClellon chooses to file an amended complaint, he must do so within 21 days of this order being issued. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER reassigning the case to the Honorable John C. Coughenour because it is related to Case No. CV18-00817JCC. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to case. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case number CV18-00909JCC. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellon v. Capital One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte McClellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Steven A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?