Lotus Lifestyle, LLC v. Burgess et al
Plaintiff: Lotus Lifestyle, LLC
Defendant: Beverage Specialists, Inc., Robert Burgess and Beverage Specialists, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00922
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulated Motion. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/4/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2018, Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 25, 2018 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND INITIAL CASE DEADLINES AND PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS, filed by Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC, Counter Defendant Lotus Lifestyle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2018, (Connors, Tiffany)
July 16, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #16 Notice of Attorney Association : corrected name of attorney appearing (Frank R. Siderius). (PM)
July 16, 2018 Attorney Frank Raymond Siderius added for Beverage Specialists, Inc. and Robert Burgess per #16 Notice of Attorney Association. (PM)
July 13, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC by Beverage Specialists, Inc., Robert Burgess.(Clement, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by William Scott Clement Frank R. Siderus on behalf of Defendants Beverage Specialists, Inc., Robert Burgess. (Clement, William) Modified on 7/16/2018 to correct name of attorney appearing (PM).
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan G. Polak for Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Cristina Costa for Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 11, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan G. Polak FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5391120 (Connors, Tiffany)
July 11, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Cristina A. Costa FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5390967 (Connors, Tiffany)
July 6, 2018 Attorney Marnie Hillary Silver for Beverage Specialists, Inc.,Marnie Hillary Silver for Robert Burgess added; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/10/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
July 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Scott Clement on behalf of Defendants Beverage Specialists, Inc., Robert Burgess. (Clement, William)
July 6, 2018 NOTE: Document #8 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Marnie H. Silver is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TH)
July 5, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Beverage Specialists, Inc. (Clement, William)
July 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Scott Clement on behalf of Defendants Beverage Specialists, Inc., Robert Burgess. (Clement, William)
June 28, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Robert Burgess, Beverage Specialists on 6/27/2018, filed by Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC. (Connors, Tiffany)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Lotus Lifestyle, LLC (Connors, Tiffany)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
June 25, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (ST)
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Beverage Specialists, Inc., Robert Burgess. (ST)
June 25, 2018 Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (ST)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lotus Lifestyle, LLC (Connors, Tiffany)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5368614) Attorney Tiffany Scott Connors added to party Lotus Lifestyle, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Lotus Lifestyle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Connors, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotus Lifestyle, LLC v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lotus Lifestyle, LLC
Represented By: Tiffany Scott Connors
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Represented By: Cristina Costa
Represented By: Pilar C French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverage Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burgess
Represented By: Marnie Hillary Silver
Represented By: William Scott Clement
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverage Specialists, Inc
Represented By: Marnie Hillary Silver
Represented By: William Scott Clement
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?