State of Washington et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Eighteen state attorneys general have sued the Trump administration over its policy of separating children from their parents at the border. The lawsuit alleges that the practice of family separations violates the due process and equal protection rights of the families.

Plaintiff: State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Washington, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Iowa, District of Columbia, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of New York, State of New Jersey and State of California
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Donald Trump, Scott Lloyd, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Thomas Homan, Alex Azar, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv00939
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
0 Judge: Richard A Jones
1 Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 92 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Southern District of California as case 3:18-cv-1979 on 8/23/2018. (PM)
August 24, 2018 91 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking Defendants' 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Defendants are instructed to re-file any requests for relief in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 23, 2018 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,,,,,, , filed by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murley, Nicole)
August 23, 2018 Case sent to District of California Southern by electronic case transfer. (SWT)
August 9, 2018 89 NOTICE striking status conference scheduled for 8/17/2018 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
August 8, 2018 89 This case will be transferred to the Southern District of California by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (SWT)
August 8, 2018 88 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendants' #22 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Court TRANSFERS this case to the Southern District of California, to be assigned to Judge Sabraw. signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
August 8, 2018 87 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Colleen Melody, Rebecca Glasgow, Megan Lin, Laura Clinton; Def Counsel: Scott Stewart, Sarah Fabian; CR: Nicki Drury; Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2018 #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Donald Trump, Thomas Homan, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Alex Azar, United States of America, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Scott Lloyd. Oral argument presented. Court GRANTS motion to transfer venue to Southern District of California. (RM)
August 7, 2018 86 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the oral argument on the motion to dismiss hearing set for 8/8/2018 at 10:00 before Marsha J. Pechman. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (RM)
August 6, 2018 85 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah B Fabian on behalf of Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Fabian, Sarah)
August 6, 2018 84 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Stewart, Scott)
August 3, 2018 83 REPLY, filed by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Press, Joshua)
August 3, 2018 82 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 7/27/2018 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3833. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2018. (BF)
August 2, 2018 81 NOTICE of Request for Video Recording of oral argument on motion to dismiss hearing on 8/8/2018 at 10:00 before Marsha J. Pechman. Parties must submit PARTY RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR VIDEO RECORDING before 8/6/2018. Please Note: This form must not be filed electronically with the Court. (RM)
August 2, 2018 80 Featured Case ORDER re #66 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tania Maestas for Plaintiff State of New Mexico, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 2, 2018 79 Featured Case ORDER re #65 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachel Wainer Apter for Plaintiff State of New Jersey, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 2, 2018 78 Featured Case ORDER re #61 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alethea M Huyser for Plaintiff State of Minnesota, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 77 Featured Case ORDER re #60 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Abigail B Taylor for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 1, 2018 76 Featured Case ORDER re #59 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Genevieve Nadeau for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 1, 2018 75 Featured Case ORDER re #58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Angela R Brooks for Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 1, 2018 74 Featured Case ORDER re #57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam D. Snyder for Plaintiff State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 73 Featured Case ORDER re #56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Julia Doyle Bernhardt for Plaintiff State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 72 Featured Case ORDER re #55 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nathanael Blake for Plaintiff State of Iowa, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 71 Featured Case ORDER re #54 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew J Martin for Plaintiff State of Illinois, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 70 Featured Case ORDER re #53 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Valerie M. Nannery for Plaintiff District of Columbia, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 69 Featured Case ORDER re #52 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robyn R Bender for Plaintiff District of Columbia, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah M Reyneveld on behalf of Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Washington. (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 67 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/28/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/4/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 31, 2018 66 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tania Maestas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New Mexico (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416520 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 65 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel Wainer Apter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of New Jersey (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416505 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 64 Featured Case ORDER re #51 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ilona M Kirshon for Plaintiff State of Delaware, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 31, 2018 63 Featured Case ORDER re #50 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Vilma R Palma-Solana for Plaintiff State of California, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 31, 2018 62 Featured Case ORDER re #49 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sarah E Belton for Plaintiff State of California, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 31, 2018 61 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alethea M. Huyser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Minnesota (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416388 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 60 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Abigail B. Taylor FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416379 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 59 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Genevieve C. Nadeau FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416368 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 58 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Angela R. Brooks FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416356 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 57 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam D. Snyder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416313 (Reyneveld, Sarah) (Main Document 57 replaced on 8/2/2018) (DS).
July 31, 2018 56 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Julia Doyle Bernhardt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416266 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 55 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nathanael Blake FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Iowa (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416258 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 54 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew J. Martin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Illinois (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416246 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 53 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Valerie M. Nannery FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff District of Columbia (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416238 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 52 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robyn R. Bender FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff District of Columbia (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416223 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 51 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ilona M. Kirshon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Delaware (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416215 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 50 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Vilma R. Palma-Solana FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of California (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5416193 (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 31, 2018 49 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E. Belton (Fee Paid) Receipt #0981-5415947 by Plaintiff State of California (Reyneveld, Sarah) Modified on 7/31/2018 (PS).
July 31, 2018 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah M Reyneveld on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Reyneveld, Sarah)
July 30, 2018 47 DECLARATION of Laura L. Clinton in Support of States' Opposition filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. OO-QQ)(Clinton, Laura)
July 30, 2018 46 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff State of Washington, to #22 MOTION to Dismiss . (Clinton, Laura)
July 30, 2018 45 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
July 30, 2018 44 NOTICE of Hearing #22 MOTION to Dismiss : ORAL ARGUMENT/Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Each side is allowed 20 minutes for argument, including rebuttal. (RM)
July 27, 2018 43 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: Laura Clinton, Megan Lin, Colleen Melody; Def Counsel: August Flentje, Joshua Press; CR: Barry Fanning; Status Conference held on 7/27/2018. See Order regarding expedited discovery (Dkt. No. 41). Next status conference is scheduled for 8/17/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
July 27, 2018 42 NOTICE OF FILING ; filed by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Press, Joshua)
July 27, 2018 41 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The Court will hear argument on Defendants' pending motion to dismiss or transfer venue, Dkt. No. #22 , on August 8, 2018, at a time to be set by further order. The Court will reconvene the status conference on August 17, 2018, at a time to be set by further order. (PM)
July 27, 2018 40 STIPULATION TO PROTECTIVE ORDER by parties (Press, Joshua)
July 27, 2018 39 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' #23 MOTION to Re-Note/Note All Pending Motions for the Same Date and Consolidate for Oral Argument. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 26, 2018 38 DECLARATION David W. Jennings of David Jennings re #36 Joint Status Report by Plaintiff State of Washington (Clinton, Laura)
July 26, 2018 37 DECLARATION Jonathan White re #36 Joint Status Report by Plaintiff State of Washington (Clinton, Laura)
July 26, 2018 36 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1st Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit MsLProtectiveOrder)(Clinton, Laura)
July 25, 2018 35 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #33 Notice of Supplemental Authority,, #22 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Press, Joshua)
July 25, 2018 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney August Flentje on behalf of Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Flentje, August)
July 19, 2018 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #22 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Press, Joshua)
July 19, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff State of Washington's #15 Motion for Expedited Discovery and Regular Status Conferences. Status Conference set for 7/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joint Status Report due by 12 noon 7/26/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 17, 2018 31 EXHIBIT Exhibits_34-66 re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences by Plaintiff State of Washington (Clinton, Laura)
July 17, 2018 30 EXHIBIT Exhibits_1-33 re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences by Plaintiff State of Washington (Clinton, Laura)
July 17, 2018 30 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences : SEALED Attachments 3 & 4 (Exhibits) due to names of minors, per phone call from counsel. Redacted Exhibits to be filed. (PM)
July 16, 2018 29 SUPPLEMENT Defendants Appendix A, Dkt. #21 -1 by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22)(Murley, Nicole)
July 13, 2018 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff State of Washington, to #23 MOTION for Relief from deadlines. (Glasgow, Rebecca)
July 13, 2018 27 DECLARATION of Megan D. Lin filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q-DD, #2 Exhibit EE-NN)(Glasgow, Rebecca)
July 13, 2018 26 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences (Glasgow, Rebecca)
July 12, 2018 25 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER rescinding the #24 Minute Order that Defendants resubmit their pleadings. Henceforth, all parties are required to submit their pleadings in 12 point Times New Roman font, and of course in conformity with all other formatting requirements of the Local Rules. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 12, 2018 24 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re: Defendants' #21 Response to Motion, #22 MOTION to Dismiss and #23 MOTION for Relief from deadlines. The Government is order to resubmit all its briefing in proper font and page length. The responsive briefing in Defendants' Opposition to the Motion for Expedited Discovery and Regular Status Conferences (Dkt. No. #21 ) shall be filed by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, July 12, 2016. The remaining pleadings must be re-formatted and refiled by Monday, July 16, 2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 11, 2018 23 MOTION for Relief from deadlines, filed by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/20/2018, (Murley, Nicole)
July 11, 2018 22 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/3/2018, (Press, Joshua)
July 11, 2018 21 RESPONSE, by Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, to #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Murley, Nicole)
July 10, 2018 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joshua S. Press on behalf of Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Press, Joshua)
July 4, 2018 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicole N. Murley on behalf of Defendants Alex Azar, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America. (Murley, Nicole)
July 3, 2018 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Motion for Expedited Discovery, #16 Declaration of Laura Clinton, #17 Certification of Compliance, Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington (Clinton, Laura) Modified to create docket entry relationship on 7/5/2018 (SWT).
July 2, 2018 17 CERTIFICATE of Colleen M. Melody re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clinton, Laura)
July 2, 2018 16 DECLARATION of Laura K. Clinton filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P)(Clinton, Laura)
July 2, 2018 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Regular Staus Conferences, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3SEALED Exhibit 1-33, #4 SEALED Exhibit 34-66, #5 Exhibit 67-99, #6 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2018, (Clinton, Laura) Modified on 7/17/2018 to seal due to names of minors, per phone call from counsel (PM).
July 2, 2018 14 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Rebecca Ripoli Glasgow on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Glasgow, Rebecca)
June 28, 2018 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United State of America on 6/27/2018, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Clinton, Laura)
June 28, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons/complaint upon the United States of America; served on 6/27/2018 by hand; upon Donald Trump and U.S. Customs and Border Protection via certified mail; served on 6/28/2018, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington (Clinton, Laura) Modified on 6/29/2018: edited text to include name, method and date parties were served. Filer used the wrong ECF event. (PM).
June 28, 2018 11 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER reassigning this matter to the Honorable Marsha J. Pechman because it is related to Case No. CV18-00928MJP. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case number CV18-00939MJP. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
June 26, 2018 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Megan Lin on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Lin, Megan)
June 26, 2018 9 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Noah Guzzo Purcell on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Purcell, Noah)
June 26, 2018 8 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Laura K Clinton on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Clinton, Laura)
June 26, 2018 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Colleen M Melody on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Melody, Colleen)
June 26, 2018 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
June 26, 2018 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (Ad Hoc, Megan Lin) (ST)
June 26, 2018 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America, Alex M. Azar, II, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2018: #13 Summons) (ST). Modified on 6/26/2018 to indicate summons issued to defendant United States of America (KB).
June 26, 2018 3 EXHIBIT Summons re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington (Clinton, Laura)
June 26, 2018 3 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
June 26, 2018 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-00928, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, The District of Columbia. (Clinton, Laura)
June 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5372043) Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Massachusetts(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Pennsylvania(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of California(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Delaware(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Illinois(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Iowa (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Maryland(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Minnesota (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New Jersey(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New Mexico(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New York(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of North Carolina(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Rhode Island (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Vermont(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party The District of Columbia(pty:pla), filed by State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, The District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of New Mexico, State of California, State of Iowa, State of Rhode Island, State of New York, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-40, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 41-80, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 81-100, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 101-110, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 111-131, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons)(Clinton, Laura)
June 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5372043) Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Massachusetts(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Pennsylvania(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of California(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Delaware(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Illinois(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Iowa (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Maryland(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Minnesota (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New Jersey(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New Mexico(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New York(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of North Carolina(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Rhode Island (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Vermont(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party The District of Columbia(pty:pla), filed by State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, The District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of New Mexico, State of California, State of Iowa, State of Rhode Island, State of New York, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-40, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 41-80, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 81-100, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 101-110, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 111-131, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons)(Clinton, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Homan
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Represented By: Nicole N. Murley
Represented By: August Flentje
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sarah B Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Adam D. Snyder
Represented By: Julia Doyle Bernhardt
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Megan Lin
Represented By: Laura K Clinton
Represented By: Noah Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Robert W Ferguson
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Rebecca Ripoli Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Scott J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Matthew J Martin
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Angela R Brooks
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Abigail B Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Nathanael Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Robyn R Bender
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Valerie M. Nannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Ilona M Kirshon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Rachel Wainer Apter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Sarah M Reyneveld
Represented By: Vilma R Palma-Solana
Represented By: Sarah E Belton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?