ITT Enidine Inc. v. General Aerospace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ITT Enidine Inc.
Defendant: General Aerospace, Inc. and General Aerospace GmbH
Case Number: 2:2018cv01108
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #14 Waiver of Service: added name of defendant waiving service (General Aerospace GmbH) and date waiver was sent. (PM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #15 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant General Aerospace, Inc. to Respond to Complaint. Defendant General Aerospace GmbH shall have until November 20, 2018 to file and serve an answer or a motion under Rule 12. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant General Aerospace, Inc. to Resond to Complaint and Jury Demand by parties (Purcell, Douglas)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons by Defendant General Aerospace GmbH; mailed on 8/22/2018 (Purcell, Douglas) Modified on 8/27/2018 to add party waiving service and add date waiver was sent (PM).
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas W Purcell on behalf of Defendants General Aerospace GmbH, General Aerospace, Inc.. (Purcell, Douglas)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #11 Stipulation : Stricken per Minute Order at Dkt. #12. (SSM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez re: #11 Stipulation filed by General Aerospace, Inc. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: Attorney Purcell has filed a stipulation for extension of deadlines in this matter on behalf of the parties. However, Attorney Purcell has not yet appeared in this action. See LCR 83.2(a). As a result, he is unable to file on behalf of any party and the Stipulation is hereby STRICKEN. In addition, Attorney Purcell failed to email a copy of the proposed Order in Word or Word Perfect format as required by the Court's Local Rules. Therefore, all current deadlines remain in effect unless or until a new Stipulation is properly filed, a proper electronic version is sent to the Court, and the request is granted by the Court. All counsel are reminded that they are required to be familiar and comply with the Court's Local Civil Rules. The failure to follow the Court's Local Civil Rules may result in sanctions. (SSM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 STRICKEN per Minute Order at Dkt. #12. STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant General Aerospace, Inc. to Respond to Complaint and Jury Demand by parties (Purcell, Douglas) Modified on 8/24/2018 (SSM).
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant General Aerospace GmbH mailed on 8/22/2018 (Purcell, Douglas)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael K Friedland for Plaintiff ITT Enidine Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas M Zovko for Plaintiff ITT Enidine Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael K. Friedland FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff ITT Enidine Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5433235 (Heideman, Colin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas M. Zovko FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff ITT Enidine Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5433219 (Heideman, Colin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant General Aerospace, Inc. on 8/3/2018 (Heideman, Colin)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG)
July 31, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc., Corporate Parent ITT Holding LLC, Corporate Parent ITT Industries Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent International Motion Control Inc. for ITT Enidine Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ITT Enidine Inc. (Heideman, Colin)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5412973) Attorney Colin Barry Heideman added to party ITT Enidine Inc.(pty:pla), filed by ITT Enidine Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons General Aerospace, Inc., #3 Summons General Aerospace GmbH, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Heideman, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ITT Enidine Inc. v. General Aerospace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITT Enidine Inc.
Represented By: Colin Barry Heideman
Represented By: Michael K Friedland
Represented By: Nicholas M Zovko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas W Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Aerospace GmbH
Represented By: Douglas W Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?