The Human Rights Defense Center et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Dillon and The Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2018cv01141
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Lambert, Michelle)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Lambert, Michelle)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Deborah M Golden for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon and for The Human Rights Defense Center, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Deborah M. Golden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5440438 (Stahl, Eric)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed by The Human Rights Defense Center, Michelle Dillon.(Stahl, Eric)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Main document - U S Dept of Homeland Security) (Attachments: #1 Summons United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement)(CDA)
August 7, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # 0981-5421921), filed by The Human Rights Defense Center, Michelle Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stahl, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Human Rights Defense Center et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Dillon
Represented By: Eric M Stahl
Represented By: Deborah M Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: Eric M Stahl
Represented By: Deborah M Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?