Canlas et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ida V Canlas and Ophello S Canlas
Defendant: Does 1-10, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, NA and MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01175
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE held before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour; Courtroom Deputy Clerk Paul Pierson; Court Reporter Nancy Bauer; Plaintiff(s) Counsel Melissa Huelsman; Defendant(s) Counsel Frederick Haist. The case was called and counsel made their appearance. The Court inquires of counsel concerning their desired trial date and time estimate for trial. Note that all depositions, discovery and perpetuation, must be completed before the discovery completion date. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described below. Counsel shall be prepared to commence trial as scheduled, but understand that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov 2-4 weeks in advance of the trial date regarding the Court`s trial calendar. Case management dates are established as follows: Court Trial is set for 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2020, Pleading amendment/3rd pty action due by 1/4/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 2/15/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/9/2020, Discovery cutoff is 120 days before trial, and the dispositive motion filing deadline is 90 days before trial.Counsel shall attend Courtroom Technology Training at least 1 month in advance of the trial date in order to become familiar utilizing the new A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Training is held at 3:00 p.m. on the 1st and 3rd Wednesday of each month in Courtroom 18B. (PP)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melissa A Huelsman on behalf of Plaintiffs Ida V Canlas, Ophello S Canlas. (Huelsman, Melissa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Haist, Frederick)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PP)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MUFG Americas Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent MUFG Bank, Ltd., Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group for MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Haist, Frederick)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Haist, Frederick)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (Letter sent to Pro Se Plaintiffs via U.S. Postal Service). (DJ).
August 13, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, MUFG Union Bank NA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/20/2018. (DJ)
August 13, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, NA (Haist, Frederick)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, NA. (Haist, Frederick)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-16446-0; (Receipt # 0981-5429317), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haist, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canlas et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida V Canlas
Represented By: Melissa A Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ophello S Canlas
Represented By: Melissa A Huelsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?