Adam v. State of Washington

Petitioner: Ibrahim Adam
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv01183
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
0 Judge: Richard A Jones
1 Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Objections to R&R due by 9/19/2018, Noting Date 9/21/2018, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(SG)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #5 RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Coyote Ridge Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)
August 27, 2018 5 PROPOSED Motion for Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Ibrahim Adam re #4 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Filer)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)
August 27, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Ibrahim Adam. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 PROPOSED Motion to Certify, #3 Note for Motion re Motion to Certify, #4 Prison Trust Account)**27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)
August 27, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter, **DO NOT PRINT**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)
August 15, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Coyote Ridge Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)
August 15, 2018 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/14/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)
August 13, 2018 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Ibrahim Adam. (No Filing Fee/No IFP) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Motion to Certify, #2 PROPOSED Note for Motion, #3 Cover Letter)**27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ibrahim Adam, Prisoner ID: 381810)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ibrahim Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?