Wallace et al v. C.R. England, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Craig Wallace and Mary McNutt
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc., Does 1 through 10 and C.R. England, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01204
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant C.R. England, Inc (Gonzalez, Justo)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/19/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/26/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 6, 2018 Pursuant to the parties' #6 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, Defendant shall have up to and including 10/17/2018 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the original complaint. (VE)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. Noting Date 9/5/2018, (Gonzalez, Justo)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justo Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Gonzalez, Justo)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) C.R. England, Inc. (DJ)
August 20, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (DJ)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mary McNutt, Craig Wallace (Haffner, Joshua)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) C.R. England, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5436769) Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Mary McNutt(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Craig Wallace(pty:pla), filed by Craig Wallace, Mary McNutt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haffner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace et al v. C.R. England, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Wallace
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McNutt
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc
Represented By: Justo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?