Singh et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Gurnek Singh and Pawan Deep Kaur
Defendant: U.S. Department of State and Michael R. Pompeo
Case Number: 2:2018cv01210
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 REDACTION to #1 Complaint #4 Redacted Document, #3 Notice to Filer, Notice to Filer,, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/22/2018 (SWT).
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 REDACTION to #1 Complaint Notice to Filer, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/21/2018 (SWT).
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
August 20, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. The exhibits attached to the complaint contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2. Specifically, the pictures of the minor child on pages 3, 8 and 9 must be redacted as well as the personal identifier on page 25. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (ST)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST)
August 20, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5437757), filed by Gurnek Singh and Pawan Deep Kaur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edward, Carol) Modified on 8/20/2018 at the request of finance to correct the case number. (ST) Modified on 8/20/2018 to seal Complaint; document contains identifiers that must be redacted per FRCP 5.2 (full last name of minor child) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurnek Singh
Represented By: Carol L. Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pawan Deep Kaur
Represented By: Carol L. Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?