Lee et al v. Korean Air Lines Co Ltd

Plaintiff: Haeyoung Lee and Jaeyoung Park
Defendant: Korean Air Lines Co Ltd
Case Number: 2:2018cv01242
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Attorney Eric J Neal added for Korean Air Lines Co Ltd added per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Lether on behalf of Defendant Korean Air Lines Co Ltd. (Lether, Thomas)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 11/27/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Korean Air Lines Co Ltd. (DJ)
August 23, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5444315) Attorney Kenneth M Chang added to party Haeyoung Lee(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth M Chang added to party Jaeyoung Park(pty:pla), filed by Haeyoung Lee, Jaeyoung Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chang, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Korean Air Lines Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korean Air Lines Co Ltd
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haeyoung Lee
Represented By: Kenneth M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaeyoung Park
Represented By: Kenneth M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?