Bettelon v. Deluxe Express Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jack Bettelon
Defendant: Sergii Mazur, Deluxe Express Inc., Jane Doe Mazur and Deluxe Express Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01292
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 11/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 11/21/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/22/2019, Motions due by 6/21/2019, Discovery completed by 7/22/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/20/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 10/4/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/21/2019, Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/13/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/13/2019. (LC)
October 19, 2018 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Scudder, Karen)
October 2, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Deluxe Express Inc, Jane Doe Mazur, Sergii Mazur.(Bolster, Justin)
September 24, 2018 6 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Eric Peter Gillett for Defendants Deluxe Express Inc, Jane Doe Mazur, Sergii Mazur from September 26, 2018 to October 9, 2018. (Gillett, Eric)
September 13, 2018 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Deluxe Express Inc, Jane Doe Mazur, Sergii Mazur (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gillett, Eric)
September 11, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Deluxe Express Inc (Gillett, Eric)
September 7, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
September 4, 2018 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Deluxe Express Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/11/2018. (DJ)
September 4, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (DJ)
August 30, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-18606-4; (Receipt # 0981-5454988), filed by Sergii Mazur, Deluxe Express Inc., Jane Doe Mazur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillett, Eric). Modified on 9/4/2018 (DJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bettelon v. Deluxe Express Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergii Mazur
Represented By: Justin E Bolster
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deluxe Express Inc.
Represented By: Justin E Bolster
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Mazur
Represented By: Justin E Bolster
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deluxe Express Inc
Represented By: Justin E Bolster
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bettelon
Represented By: Karen J Scudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?