Wood v. United States Department of the Army
Plaintiff: Arlyn Wood
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Case Number: 2:2018cv01317
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' Stipulated Motion for Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report (Dkt. No. #10 ), HEREBY ORDERS that this case is exempt from the initial disclosure requirements of Rule 26(a)(1), as well as from the requirements of Rule 26(f). The Court further orders that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 29, 2019 in which the parties inform the Court of their progress on resolving this matter or, if necessary, propose a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act requests. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SWT)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for relief from discovery requirements by parties (Lambert, Michelle)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Department of the Army.(Lambert, Michelle)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant United States Department of the Army. (Lambert, Michelle)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of counsel, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 12/20/2018. All other FRCP 26-related dates are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/6/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2018, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Department of the Army. (PM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Amended Summons to US Army by Plaintiff Arlyn Wood (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons)(Crotty, Matthew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States Department of the Army on 9/19/2018 (U.S. Attorney General on 9/11/2018; U.S. Dept. of the Army on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Crotty, Matthew) Modified on 9/21/2018 to include names of those served (PM).
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Department of the Army (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
September 11, 2018 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (ST)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for FOIA violation against defendant(s) United States Department of the Army (Receipt # 0981-5462763) Attorney Matthew Z Crotty added to party Arlyn Wood(pty:pla), filed by Arlyn Wood. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crotty, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. United States Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlyn Wood
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?