Galindo et al v. Tristate Roofing Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Sanchez Galindo and Rogelio Sanchez Galindo
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Co. and Tristate Roofing Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01337
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (TH)
September 13, 2018 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Oscar Sanchez Galindo, Rogelio Sanchez Galindo (Haynes, Beau)
September 13, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia Kay Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Tristate Roofing Inc.. (Buchanan, Patricia)
September 13, 2018 7 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 12, 2018 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
September 12, 2018 4 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SG)
September 12, 2018 3 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SG) Modified on 9/12/2018 incorrect attorney notified - Patricia K Buchanan has improper secondary signature (SG). Modified on 9/12/2018 (SG).
September 12, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SG)
September 10, 2018 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Tristate Roofing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3, #4 Exhibit Attachment 4, #5 Exhibit Attachment 5, #6 Exhibit Attachment 6)(Jackson, Sean)
September 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-19991-3 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5465202), filed by Tristate Roofing Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galindo et al v. Tristate Roofing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Sanchez Galindo
Represented By: David N Mark
Represented By: Beau C. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Sanchez Galindo
Represented By: David N Mark
Represented By: Beau C. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Stephen M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristate Roofing Inc.
Represented By: Sean David Jackson
Represented By: Patricia Kay Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?