Aptus Health, Inc v. Doe, 1 et al
Plaintiff: Aptus Health, Inc. and Aptus Health, Inc
Defendant: John Doe, 2 and John Doe, 1
Case Number: 2:2018cv01351
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) John Doe, 2, John Doe, 1 with JURY DEMAND, filed by Aptus Health, Inc.(Sortun, Anna)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Aptus Health Holdings, Inc. for Aptus Health, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aptus Health, Inc (Sortun, Anna)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/25/2018. (SG)
September 18, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Viral Dalia filed by Plaintiff Aptus Health, Inc re #2 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery (Sortun, Anna)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Aptus Health, Inc. Noting Date 9/17/2018, (Sortun, Anna)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5469160), filed by Aptus Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sortun, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aptus Health, Inc v. Doe, 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aptus Health, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Sortun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aptus Health, Inc
Represented By: Anna Sortun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?