Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Safeway, Inc
Plaintiff: EEOC and Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Safeway, Inc. and Safeway, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01352
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Safeway, Inc.(Reilly, D)
November 7, 2018 Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report deadline extended to 12/6/2018 per Dkt. # 10. (KERR)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teri L Healy for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission from 10-20-18 to 10-29-18. (Healy, Teri)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting defendant Safeway, Inc.'s #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/9/2018; Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement is also extended thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Other Deadlines, filed by Defendant Safeway, Inc. Noting Date 10/9/2018, (Reilly, D)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 9, 2018 Attorney Priya Bhoplay Vivian for Safeway, Inc added per #6 Notice of Appearance. (ELS)
October 5, 2018 Attorney Beth G Joffe for Safeway, Inc added; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AB Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Albertsons Holdings LLC for Safeway, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeway, Inc (Reilly, D)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Safeway, Inc. (Reilly, D)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Safeway on 9/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Healy, Teri)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance)(Healy, Teri)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Safeway, Inc. (DJ)
September 14, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Teri L Healy on behalf of Plaintiff EEOC. (Healy, Teri)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Safeway, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Attorney Roberta Steele added to party EEOC(pty:pla), filed by EEOC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Safeway, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc
Represented By: Priya Bhoplay Vivian
Represented By: Beth G Joffe
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Represented By: Teri L Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?