Martinez Diaz et al v United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Viacheslav Poliakov and Raquel Martinez Diaz
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Does 1 - 10, Ronald D. Vitiello, William Penaloza, Bryan S. Wilcox, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Cynthia Munita
Case Number: 2:2018cv01356
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (GMR)
October 26, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Raquel Martinez Diaz (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying #4 Motion for TRO.(TG)
September 19, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Raquel Martinez Diaz re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Supplemental Information) (Alexander, Edward)
September 18, 2018 MINUTE ORDER at the direction of Judge Benjamin H. Settle: Upon review of Defendants' response (Dkt. 24-1), the Court finds that a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is not necessary. Therefore, the Court strikes the hearing set for today at 3:00 PM. A written order addressing the merits of Plaintiffs' motion will follow. (TG)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 PRAECIPE re #20 Response to Motion, by Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox (Attachments: #1 Corrected Dkt. 20)(Chan, Priscilla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Sheri Malakhova, MD filed by Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Chan, Priscilla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Drew H. Bostock filed by Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chan, Priscilla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Priscilla T. Chan filed by Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chan, Priscilla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox, to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Priscilla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Priscilla To-Yin Chan on behalf of Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox. (Chan, Priscilla)
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox. (Morehead, Sarah)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING *TIME: TRO Hearing is reset for 9/18/2018 at *3:00 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Y. Junga Subedar re Notice and Service of Process of Motion for TRO filed by Plaintiff Raquel Martinez Diaz re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Alexander, Edward)
September 14, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cynthia Munita, Bryan WIlcox, William Penaloza on 9/14/2018, filed by Plaintiff Viacheslav Poliakov. (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date, Set/Reset Hearings. (Service of corrected image to add Order to docket is attached). (TG)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Partially Withdrawing Referral, Requesting Response and Setting Hearing by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. TRO Hearing set for 9/18/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cynthia Munita, Kristjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(ST)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Subedar, Exhibits F - J filed by Petitioner Viacheslav Poliakov re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Subedar, Exhibits A - E filed by Petitioner Viacheslav Poliakov re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Poliakov filed by Petitioner Viacheslav Poliakov re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Liakhovetskiy filed by Petitioner Viacheslav Poliakov re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Giwe Siki filed by Plaintiff Raquel Martinez Diaz re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Racquel Martinez Diaz filed by Plaintiff Viacheslav Poliakov re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 **DISREGARD** Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cynthia Munita, Kristjen Nielsen, William Penaloza, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Bryan S. Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(ST) Modified on 9/13/2018. Case should have been filed in Tacoma. Summons to be reissued with newly assigned Tacoma judges. (ST)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Raquel Martinez Diaz. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed TRO) Noting Date 9/13/2018, (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Viacheslav Poliakov. (Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Viacheslav Poliakov (Attachments: #1 Summons summons-ICE, #2 Summons summons-Munita, #3 Summons summons-Nielsen, #4 Summons summons-Penaloza, #5 Summons summons-Vitiello, #6 Summons summons-Wilcox)(Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) Ronald D. Vitiello, Kristjen Nielsen, Viacheslav Poliakov, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # 0981-5469918), filed by Raquel Martinez Diaz.(Subedar, Yeun Junga)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: Filer should have opened case in Tacoma. Case has been reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge Theresa Fricke. Summons issued under #5 have been stricken. Summons will be reissued with case number and newly assigned judge(s) initials. (ST)
September 13, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ST)
September 13, 2018 **DISREGARD** Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST) Modified on 9/13/2018. It has been determined that filer should have opened case in Tacoma. Reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge Theresa Fricke.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Diaz et al v United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Penaloza
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan S. Wilcox
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viacheslav Poliakov
Represented By: Yeun Junga Subedar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Martinez Diaz
Represented By: Edward S Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?