Garvie v. State of Washington

Petitioner: Eugene Brian Garvie
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv01371
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: James L Robart
1 Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time re #5 Order, filed by Petitioner Eugene Brian Garvie. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(ST)
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2018, **DO NOT PRINT**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(SG)
October 16, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER DECLINING SERVICE OF HABEAS PETITION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Court will not serve the petition. If Mr. Garvie wishes to file anamended petition, he may do so no later than November 16, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)**19 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(SG)
October 11, 2018 4 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Eugene Brian Garvie. (Receipt # SEA092832) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**140 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(ST)
October 11, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 5.00, receipt number SEA092832 **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(ST)
October 10, 2018 3 LETTER re payment of filing fee re #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eugene Brian Garvie **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(ST)
September 19, 2018 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS sent to petitioner for filing **16 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(SG)
September 19, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 10/19/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFPHabeas Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(SG)
September 17, 2018 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Eugene Brian Garvie (NO FILING FEE, NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**140 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Eugene Garvie, Prisoner ID: 307014)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvie v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene Brian Garvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?