The University of Washington et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: The University of Washington, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington and Angelina Godoy
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2018cv01396
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 US Attorney's Office, Washington D.C)(AE)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Clark, Jordan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Clark, Jordan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Clark, Jordan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, to U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security (Clark, Jordan)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas R Burke for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, and for The University of Washington, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas R. Burke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5493492 (Clark, Jordan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(CDA)
September 24, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CDA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # 0981-5481227) Attorney Jordan Clark added to party Angelina Godoy(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Clark added to party The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Clark added to party The University of Washington(pty:pla), filed by The University of Washington, Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-KK, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Clark, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The University of Washington et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The University of Washington
Represented By: Jordan Clark
Represented By: Thomas R Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington
Represented By: Jordan Clark
Represented By: Thomas R Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Godoy
Represented By: Jordan Clark
Represented By: Thomas R Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?