McGlown v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Meredith McGlown
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security and UCIS Application Support Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv01403
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT on the determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SWT)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED; All pending Motions are to be terminated by the Clerk as moot; This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #10 Response to Order to Show Cause,. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2 and FRCP 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to LCR 5.2 and FRCP 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (TH)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Meredith McGlown (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit A, #2 SEALED Exhibit B, #3 SEALED Exhibit C, #4 SEALED Exhibit D) (TH) Modified on 10/22/2018 to administratively seal exhibits as they contain personal identifiers (TH).
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 WORD MINUTE STIPULATION filed by Plaintiff Meredith McGlown. (TH)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE: Plaintiff Meredith McGlown has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. (PS)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file this Response will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Meredith McGlown. Noted by Clerk for 10/19/2018. (PM)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Department of Homeland Security, UCIS Application Support Center (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Meredith McGlown. (PM)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and recommending review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (ST)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Meredith McGlown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Motion for Court Appointed Counsel, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on Patent or Trademark)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlown v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith McGlown
Represented By: Meredith McGlown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCIS Application Support Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?