Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: EEOC and Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc. and South Hill Operations, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01411
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Life Care Centers of America, Inc., South Hill Operations, LLC (Belzberg, Adam)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Care Centers of America, Inc., South Hill Operations, LLC.(Belzberg, Adam)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amanda J Hailey on behalf of Defendants Life Care Centers of America, Inc., South Hill Operations, LLC. (Hailey, Amanda)
October 23, 2018 Reset Deadlines -- By agreement of the parties, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2018, Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018. Additionally, the parties have agreed Defendants may have a two-week continuance of the service date for their Answer. (VE)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/2/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/9/2018, Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam S. Belzberg on behalf of Defendants Life Care Centers of America, Inc., South Hill Operations, LLC. (Belzberg, Adam)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Life Care Centers of America, Inc on 10/5/2018, filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Lee, Damien)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Life Care Centers of America, Inc. (DJ)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Damien Anthony Lee on behalf of Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Lee, Damien)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to attach document Dkt. 1-3, Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Damien)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Life Care Centers of America, Inc., South Hill Operations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST)
September 26, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Roberta Steele added to party EEOC(pty:pla), filed by EEOC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta) (Fee Waived) Modified on 9/26/2018 to reflect no jury demand properly filed (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Belzberg
Represented By: Amanda J Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Hill Operations, LLC
Represented By: Adam S. Belzberg
Represented By: Amanda J Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Roberta Steele
Represented By: Damien Anthony Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?