The Estate of Ana Mendieta et al v. Amazon.com Service, Inc et al

Plaintiff: The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC, The Estate of Ana Mendieta, Ana Mendieta Collection LLC and Ann Mendieta
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services Inc., dba Amazon Studios, Amazon.com, Inc and Amazon.com Service, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01426
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT on the determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (TH)
October 24, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party pursuant to the parties' #8 Stipulation of Dismissal and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (VE)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Ana Mendieta Collection LLC, Ann Mendieta re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal of First Amended Complaint with Prejudice (Hoffman, Barbara)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by parties re #2 Amended Complaint, (Hoffman, Barbara)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Copyright. Mailed via USPS to the U.S. Copyright Office. (DJ)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Estate of Ana Mendieta (Hoffman, Barbara)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Service, Inc. (DJ)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
September 28, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/5/2018. (DJ)
September 28, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (DJ)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT The Estate of Ana Mendieta and The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Barbara Hoffman added to party The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC(pty:pla), filed by The Estate of Ana Mendieta, The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Barbara)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT The Estate of Ana Mendieta and The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5488844) Attorney Barbara Hoffman added to party The Estate of Ana Mendieta(pty:pla), filed by The Estate of Ana Mendieta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Ana Mendieta et al v. Amazon.com Service, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ana Mendieta Collection LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ana Mendieta
Represented By: Barbara Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Mendieta Collection LLC
Represented By: Barbara Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Mendieta
Represented By: Barbara Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc., dba Amazon Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?