The Human Rights Defense Center et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Dillon and The Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families and Office of Refugee Resettlement
Case Number: 2:2018cv01442
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting parties' #15 stipulated motion asking the court to vacate the deadlines set forth in its November 2, 2018, order #14 . Parties are ordered to submit a Joint Status Report described in their stipulated motion (Dkt. #15 ) by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Rule 26 relief by parties (Lambert, Michelle)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2018. (AD)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Lambert, Michelle)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Lambert, Michelle)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Office of Refugee ReSettlement on 10/4/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Administration for Children and Families on 10/4/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services on 10/4/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Office of Refugee ReSettlement on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Administration for Children and Families on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services on 10/3/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Deborah M Golden for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon and The Human Rights Defense Center, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Deborah M. Golden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5495958 (Roller, Jeremy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Human Rights Defense Center (Roller, Jeremy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Administration for Children and Families, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DJ)
October 2, 2018 Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ)
October 2, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) The Human Rights Defense Center must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/9/2018. (DJ)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5492451) Attorney Jeremy E Roller added to party Michelle Dillon(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy E Roller added to party The Human Rights Defense Center(pty:pla), filed by The Human Rights Defense Center, Michelle Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (U.S. Department of Health and Human Services), #3 Summons (Administration for Children and Families), #4 Summons (Office of Refugee Resettlement))(Roller, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Human Rights Defense Center et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Dillon
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Represented By: Deborah M Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Represented By: Deborah M Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?