Durbin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mark F Durbin
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv01446
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Courtney Mertes Garcia on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Garcia, Courtney)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to defendant by Plaintiff Mark F Durbin re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons (SWT)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued in Paper Form as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (TH) (Original summons with court crimp seal mailed to Plaintiff via USPS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill with JURY DEMAND, filed by Mark F Durbin. (TH)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SNP)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A. Tsuchida, filed by Mark F Durbin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Email for New Case)(SNP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durbin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark F Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Courtney Mertes Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?