Sahota v. The Islander

Plaintiff: Bavan Singh Sahota
Defendant: The Islander
Case Number: 2:2018cv01455
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #13 Return of Service by USMO : Modified docket text to indicate Released per Order on 10/25/2018 (SWT)
November 7, 2018 14 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Vessel Arrest on 10/19/2018 (SWT)
November 7, 2018 13 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Released per Order on 10/25/2018 vessel arrest on 10/19/2018 (SWT) Modified on 11/7/2018 (SWT).
October 26, 2018 12 MINUTE ORDER re: Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Dismiss for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. The United States Marshal is directed to RELEASE the vessel, Official No. 248189, from arrest. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(PM) cc: 2 certified copies of order hand delivered to the USMO.
October 25, 2018 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Order for Release of Vessel, filed by Plaintiff Bavan Singh Sahota. Noting Date 10/25/2018, (Carew, Shane)
October 24, 2018 10 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 22, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 4, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (Copies hand delivered to USMO)
October 4, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Arrest Vessel signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (Attachments: #1 In Rem Arrest Warrant) (TH) (Copies hand delivered to USMO)
October 3, 2018 6 DECLARATION of Shane Carew filed by Plaintiff Bavan Singh Sahota re #4 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Carew, Shane)
October 3, 2018 5 DECLARATION of Buck Fowler, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Bavan Singh Sahota re #4 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Carew, Shane)
October 3, 2018 4 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian, filed by Plaintiff Bavan Singh Sahota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian) Noting Date 10/3/2018, (Carew, Shane)
October 3, 2018 3 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
October 3, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
October 3, 2018 2 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel , filed by Plaintiff Bavan Singh Sahota. (Attachments: #1 Warrant, #2 Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Arrest Warrant) Noting Date 10/3/2018, (Carew, Shane)
October 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Islander (Receipt # 0981-5495537) Attorney Shane C. Carew added to party Bavan Singh Sahota(pty:pla), filed by Bavan Singh Sahota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carew, Shane). Modified on 10/3/2018 (DJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahota v. The Islander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Islander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bavan Singh Sahota
Represented By: Shane C. Carew
Represented By: Francisco Alfredo Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?