El-Shawary v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Guirguis El-Shawary
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Xome Inc. and Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Nominal Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corp of Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv01456
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Christopher Varallo, on behalf of Defendants, on 11/7/2018. (Ortiz, Arthur)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 23, 2018 Attorney Steven Joseph Dixson for Nationstar Mortgage LLC,Steven Joseph Dixson for U.S. Bank National Association,Steven Joseph Dixson for Xome Inc. added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher G. Varallo on behalf of Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Xome Inc.. (Varallo, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 REDACTION to #4 Report, expert report at Dkt. 4-11 by Plaintiff Guirguis El-Shawary (Ortiz, Arthur)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quality Loan Services Corp of Washington, U.S. Bank National Association, Xome Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GT)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #4 Report/Exhibit #11. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2 and FRCP 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to LCR 5.2 and FRCP 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (GT)
October 4, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT re #1 Complaint, Expert Report by Plaintiff Guirguis El-Shawary (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Ortiz, Arthur) Sealed Exhibit #11 due to personal identifier(s). (GT)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Arthur Ortiz re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Guirguis El-Shawary (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ortiz, Arthur)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of plaintiff, Guirguis El-Shawary re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Guirguis El-Shawary (Ortiz, Arthur)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5495612) Attorney Arthur E Ortiz added to party Guirguis El-Shawary(pty:pla), filed by Guirguis El-Shawary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ortiz, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Shawary v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xome Inc.
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Quality Loan Services Corp of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guirguis El-Shawary
Represented By: Arthur E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?