Bautista v. Concesionaria Vuela Compania De Aviacion S.A.B. de C.V. et al

Plaintiff: Berenice Bautista
Defendant: DOES 1-100, CONCESIONARIA VUELA COMPANIA DE AVIACION d/b/a VOL VOLARIS and Concesionaria Vuela Compania De Aviacion, S.A.B. de C.V.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01463
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/17/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
October 17, 2018 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Concesionaria Vuela Compania De Aviacion, S.A.B. de C.V. (SWT)
October 16, 2018 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Berenice Bautista (Valencia, Favian)
October 15, 2018 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Berenice Bautista. (Valencia, Favian)
October 10, 2018 2 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
October 10, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (DJ)
October 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5497921) Attorney Favian Valencia added to party Berenice Bautista(pty:pla), filed by Berenice Bautista.(Valencia, Favian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista v. Concesionaria Vuela Compania De Aviacion S.A.B. de C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berenice Bautista
Represented By: Favian Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCESIONARIA VUELA COMPANIA DE AVIACION d/b/a VOL VOLARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concesionaria Vuela Compania De Aviacion, S.A.B. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?