Bluetooth SIG, Inc. v. FCA US, LLC

Plaintiff: Bluetooth SIG, Inc.
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01493
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines: By agreement of the parties, the FRCP 26(f) conference deadline is extended to 12/3/2018, and the deadline to exchange Initial Disclosures is extended to 12/10/2018. The deadline for submission of the Joint Status Report remains unchanged. (VE)
November 19, 2018 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCA US, LLC.(Varas, Christopher)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erica Chanin for Defendant FCA US, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Judith Powell for Defendant FCA US, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 1, 2018 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erica Chanin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant FCA US, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5528898 (Varas, Christopher)
November 1, 2018 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Judith Powell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant FCA US, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5528890 (Varas, Christopher)
November 1, 2018 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on FCA US, LLC on 10/15/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bluetooth SIG, Inc.. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/26/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/3/2018, Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 29, 2018 Pursuant to the parties' #16 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, Defendant FCA's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including 11/19/2018. (VE)
October 29, 2018 20 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 29, 2018 19 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. Cc to RAJ. (AE)
October 29, 2018 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned 10/31/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
October 26, 2018 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by FCA US, LLC (Varas, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 16 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Varas, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Theodore Varas on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Varas, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey Lombard on behalf of Plaintiff Bluetooth SIG, Inc.. (Lombard, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 13 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
October 12, 2018 12 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant FCA US, LLC (GT)
October 12, 2018 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. Email to the US Patent Office. (GT)
October 12, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shane M Rumbaugh for Bluetooth SIG, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Vincent J Badolato for Bluetooth SIG, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Susan P Christoff for Bluetooth SIG, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Willsey for Bluetooth SIG, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 12, 2018 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shane M. Rumbaugh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bluetooth SIG, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5505241 (Durbin, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan P. Christoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bluetooth SIG, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5504778 (Durbin, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Vincent J. Badolato FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bluetooth SIG, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5504755 (Durbin, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter J. Willsey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bluetooth SIG, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5504740 (Durbin, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bluetooth SIG, Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) FCA US, LLC with JURY DEMAND Attorney Christopher B. Durbin added to party Bluetooth SIG, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Bluetooth SIG, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #9 Jury Demand)(Durbin, Christopher) (Receipt # 0981-5504546) Modified on 10/11/2018 (PS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluetooth SIG, Inc. v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Theodore Varas
Represented By: Erica Chanin
Represented By: Judith Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluetooth SIG, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Durbin
Represented By: Jeffrey Lombard
Represented By: Vincent J Badolato
Represented By: Shane M Rumbaugh
Represented By: Peter Willsey
Represented By: Susan P Christoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?