Nguyen v. Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc

Plaintiff: Quan Nguyen
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc. and Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01503
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 9 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The parties' stipulated request to continue the following deadlines by 30 days is granted: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/20/2018, Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
November 16, 2018 8 REPLY, filed by Defendant Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dance, Timothy)
November 13, 2018 7 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Quan Nguyen, to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Albert, Gregory)
October 22, 2018 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Dance, Timothy)
October 22, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc (Dance, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Quan Nguyen (Albert, Gregory)
October 16, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/13/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/20/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
October 15, 2018 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Diamond Resorts International Marketing Inc, must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/22/2018. (DJ)
October 15, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (DJ)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-24060-3 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5506241), filed by Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Complaint)(Dance, Timothy). Modified on 10/15/2018 (DJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J Dance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc
Represented By: Timothy J Dance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quan Nguyen
Represented By: Gregory W Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?