Bombardier Inc v. Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bombardier Inc. and Bombardier Inc
Defendant: Marc-Antoine Delarche, Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc., Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation, Laurus Basson, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski, Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc., Keith Ayre, John and/or Jane Does 1-88, Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc and Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01543
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Erin Lindsay Calkins. Filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Calkins, Erin) Modified address for Attorney Erin Lindsay Calkins on 12/11/2018 (DS).
December 10, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin Lindsay Calkins on behalf of Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Calkins, Erin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Jerry A. Riedinger re #49 Brief by Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gaston, Mary)
December 7, 2018 Filing 49 Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America, Inc.'s BRIEF re #45 Order on Stipulated Motion,, Set Deadlines, on Scheduling Issues by Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc (Gaston, Mary)
December 7, 2018 Filing 48 AEROTEC DEFENDANTS' BRIEF re #45 Order on Stipulated Motion,, Set Deadlines, by Defendants Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc, Laurus Basson, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski (Omata, Richard)
December 7, 2018 Filing 47 BRIEF re #45 Order on Stipulated Motion,, Set Deadlines, by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc (Denkenberger, John)
December 5, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. Noting Date 1/4/2019, (McMahon, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones denying #44 Stipulated MOTION for a Scheduling Conference. The Court DENIES the parties' request for a scheduling conference. Instead, no later than 12/7/2018, the Court will require the parties to each file a brief which shall not exceed 10 pages in length setting forth the parties' respective positions regarding the issues set forth in the stipulation. (VE)
November 28, 2018 Filing 44 Stipulated MOTION for a Scheduling Conference, filed by Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/28/2018, (Gaston, Mary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE (Stipulated Notice of Agreement to Extend Time for Defendants Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc., Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc., Michel Korwin Szymanowski, Laurus Basson and Cindy Dorneval to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,,, ; filed by Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. (Gaston, Mary)
November 21, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. Noting Date 12/14/2018, (Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Chris Dathe filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 40 DECLARATION of John D. Denkenberger filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc, TO RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of John D. Denkenberger filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc, TO RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. on 10/31/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. on 10/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 34 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Marc-Antoine Delarche (TH)
November 8, 2018 Filing 33 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Marc-Antoine Delarche by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc (Denkenberger, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Jerry A. Riedinger filed by Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Gaston, Mary)
November 7, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE, by Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc, to #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (Gaston, Mary)
November 7, 2018 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Richard J. Omata filed by Defendants Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc, Laurus Basson, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Bailey, Mark)
November 7, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Defendants Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc, Laurus Basson, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski, to #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (Bailey, Mark)
November 7, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard J. Omata on behalf of Defendants Laurus Basson, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski. (Omata, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark A Bailey on behalf of Defendants Laurus Basson, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski. (Bailey, Mark)
November 6, 2018 Attorney James Sanders for Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc added; per #26 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 6, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shylah Renee Alfonso on behalf of Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. (Alfonso, Shylah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. Noting Date 12/7/2018, (Denkenberger, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation for Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc (Gaston, Mary)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc (Bailey, Mark)
October 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. Noting Date 11/9/2018, (McMahon, Brian)
October 26, 2018 Attorneys Mack Harrison Shultz, Jr and Jerry A Riedinger added for Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. per #15 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
October 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark A Bailey on behalf of Defendant Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc. (Bailey, Mark)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cindy Dorneval on 10/24/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Laurus Basson on 10/24/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michel Korwin-Szymanowski on 10/24/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc. on 10/24/2018, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard J. Omata on behalf of Defendant Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc. (Omata, Richard)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mary P Gaston on behalf of Defendant Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. (Gaston, Mary)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Francis McMahon on behalf of Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. (McMahon, Brian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc, Keith Ayre, Laurus Basson, Marc-Antoine Delarche, Cindy Dorneval, Michel Korwin-Szymanowski, Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation, Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(DJ)
October 22, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (DJ)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Moshe Toledano in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Nicole LEcuyer in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of David Tidd in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. re #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Daniel Burns in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc. re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-J to the Declaration of Daniel Burns and Exhibit A to the Declaration of David Tidd in Support of Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Bombardier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bombardier Inc. (Denkenberger, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5514261) Attorney John D Denkenberger added to party Bombardier Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Bombardier Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation, #3 Summons to Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc., #4 Summons to Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc., #5 Summons to Michel Korwin-Szymanowski, #6 Summons to Laurus Basson, #7 Summons to Marc-Antoine Delarche, #8 Summons to Cindy Dorneval, #9 Summons to Keith Ayre, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G, #17 Exhibit H, #18 Exhibit I, #19 Exhibit J, #20 Exhibit K, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M, #23 Exhibit N, #24 Exhibit O, #25 Exhibit P, #26 Exhibit Q, #27 Exhibit R)(Denkenberger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bombardier Inc v. Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc-Antoine Delarche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurus Basson
Represented By: Richard J. Omata
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Dorneval
Represented By: Richard J. Omata
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Korwin-Szymanowski
Represented By: Richard J. Omata
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-88
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation America Inc
Represented By: Mary Z Gaston
Represented By: Jerry A Riedinger
Represented By: Shylah Renee Alfonso
Represented By: James Sanders
Represented By: Mack Harrison Shultz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerospace Testing Engineering & Certification Inc
Represented By: Richard J. Omata
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bombardier Inc.
Represented By: John D Denkenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bombardier Inc
Represented By: John D Denkenberger
Represented By: Brian Francis McMahon
Represented By: Erin Lindsay Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?